CT SB00437 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - File Number 712
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - File Number 712
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish licensure requirements for genetic counselors.
Title
An Act Concerning The Practice Of Natureopathy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | File Number 712 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-30 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-14 | Senate | File Number 520 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 354 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/17 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |