CT SB00436 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 488
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - File Number 488
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit the Office of Policy and Management to establish advisory boards for data governance, redefine executive branch agency and delete a requirement for an annual report concerning high value data.
Title
An Act Concerning Data Governance Among Executive Branch Agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | File Number 488 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 332 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |