CT SB00428 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To increase funding for the purpose of funding the delivery of legal services to the poor.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding Of Legal Services For The Poor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 160 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 16-26 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-04-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 488 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3866 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-20 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2016-04-07 | Senate | File Number 560 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 357 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |