CT SB00426 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To create a task force that will examine and make recommendations on different mechanisms to increase legal representation in civil proceedings in the state of Connecticut.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Creating A Task Force To Improve Access To Legal Counsel In Civil Matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 273 AS AMENDED (Y: 122 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 167 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-10SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-05-26SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2016-05-26SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2016-05-25SenateSpecial Act 16-19
2016-05-04SenateIn Concurrence
2016-05-04SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-05-04SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 486
2016-04-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-21SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2016-04-21SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4441
2016-04-07SenateFile Number 559
2016-04-07SenateSenate Calendar Number 356
2016-04-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-04-07SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-01SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-22SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-21SenateJoint Favorable
2016-03-14SenatePublic Hearing 03/18
2016-03-08SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback