CT SB00425 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a basic health program providing coverage for persons under sixty-five years of age with family income up to two hundred per cent of the federal poverty level.
Title
An Act Concerning A Basic Health Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-16 | File Number 429 | |
2012-04-16 | Senate Calendar Number 322 | |
2012-04-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-09 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-03-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-16 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |
2012-03-13 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |