CT SB00421 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-17 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand the preference for in-state bidders in the award of municipal contracts and to provide a bidding advantage in state contracts for contractors who create jobs for state residents.
Title
An Act Concerning Certain Bidding Preferences In State And Municipal Contracting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 389 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 251 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |