CT SB00421 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - File Number 464
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - File Number 464
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend various elections statutes and to provide that Woodbrige shall hold municipal elections in November, rather than May.
Title
An Act Concerning Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | File Number 464 | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Calendar Number 323 | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-08 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |
2010-03-05 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |