CT SB00420 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-03 - Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Office of Policy and Management to establish a pilot program to identify residents with unmet needs based on unpaid water utility bills for the purpose of implementing programs to assist such residents in meeting their needs.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Identify Residents With Unmet Needs Based On Unpaid Water Utility Bills.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Planning and Development |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-26 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-06 | Senate | File Number 518 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 338 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/16 5:00 PM |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |