CT SB00414 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Bill Passed Temporarily
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a citizens in need account to receive charitable contributions to assist residents of this state who have had their benefits from state social services programs administered by the Department of Social Services reduced due to state budgetary constraints, and to provide a state tax deduction at the rate of two hundred per cent of the amount contributed to said account.
Title
An Act Establishing A Tax Deduction For Contributions To A Citizens In Need Account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 PASS (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Bill Passed Temporarily |
2018-05-04 | Senate | House Calendar Number 503 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-04-17 | Senate | File Number 548 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 333 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |