CT SB00413 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To waive for veterans the fee for the (1) application, (2) initial license, (3) initial permit, (4) initial registration, or (5) other initial credential, required for occupational licensure.
Title
An Act Waiving Certain Fees For Veterans For Occupational Licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Joint - VA Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |