CT SB00389 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize chief probation officers and supervisory judicial marshals to administer oaths in the performance of their duties, to remove the political party restriction on who may serve on the State Marshal Commission, to remove the restriction on who the Chief Justice may designate to serve on the State Library Board, to remove a retired judge from the membership of the Board of Firearms Permit Examiners, to clarify whether the court has to schedule a restraining order application for a hearing, regardless of whether the affidavit meets the statutory criteria, to allow the Chief Court Administrator to place venue of housing matters in the judicial district, to clarify that contact by a respondent upon a protected person in certain instances does not constitute a violation of a restraining order, to allow an authorized official of the Judicial Branch to purchase body armor on behalf of a judicial marshal, to make minor and technical changes to bail bonds, to repeal a statute authorizing a special education pilot program, and to repeal the Wrongful Conviction Commission.
Title
An Act Concerning Court Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 364 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 14-207 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 536 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5494 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5055 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-25 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Education |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Education |
2014-04-17 | Senate | File Number 611 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 403 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |