CT SB00385 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-18 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
Pending: Joint Labor and Public Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To apply the independent contractor standard to owner operators in the motor carrier industry.
Title
An Act Concerning Owner Operators In The Motor Carrier Industry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |
2012-04-11 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-11 | No New File by Committee on Commerce | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-11 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce | |
2012-03-29 | File Number 166 | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 171 | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-08 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |