CT SB00384 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-06 - House Calendar Number 545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-06 - House Calendar Number 545
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To expand mental health parity requirements, require that health carriers report additional data to the Insurance Department, and require that the Connecticut Health Insurance Exchange submit a report to the General Assembly regarding the all-payer claims database.
Title
An Act Concerning Mental Health Parity, Data Reported By Managed Care Organizations And The All-payer Claims Database.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 213 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 545 |
2018-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5197 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | File Number 338 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 210 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 10:00 AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |