CT SB00382 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 614
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a Connecticut new markets tax credit program for calendar years 2023 and 2024.
Title
An Act Concerning A Connecticut New Market Tax Credit Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 614 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 442 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |