CT SB00373 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the interaction of Article 4A of the Uniform Commercial Code and the Electronic Fund Transfer Act, as recommended by the National Conference of Commissioners on Uniform State Laws.
Title
An Act Concerning The Uniform Commercial Code, The Electronic Fund Transfer Act And The Issuance Of Subpoenas On A Nonparty Witness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 386 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 243 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |