CT SB00368 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow a health care center that provides only dental services to be licensed in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Insurance Department's Market Conduct Authority And Data Call Confidentiality, Authorizing Multistate Health Care Centers In Connecticut, Eliminating A Health Carrier Utilization Review Report Filing Requirement, And Concerning Licensure Of Single Purpose Dental Health Care Centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 295 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 122 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 280 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 276 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 280 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Public Act 16-213 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2016-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 561 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5357 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 5194 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 5194 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-21 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Public Health |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health |
2016-04-04 | Senate | File Number 440 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 295 |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |