CT SB00366 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-02 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To revise record retention and erasure requirements with respect to delinquency and family with service needs proceedings in the Superior Court.
Title
An Act Concerning The Erasure Of Records In Delinquency And Family With Service Needs Matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-02 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4450 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | File Number 540 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 369 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |