CT SB00364 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a pilot program that shall provide access to legal counsel for indigent individuals in certain civil matters involving allegations of abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Access To Legal Counsel For Indigent Individuals In Certain Civil Matters Involving Allegations Of Abuse.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2017-05-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-23SenateJoint Favorable
2017-05-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2017-04-20SenateFile Number 668
2017-04-20SenateSenate Calendar Number 350
2017-04-20SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-04-20SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-13SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM
2017-04-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-03-31SenateJoint Favorable
2017-03-23SenatePublic Hearing 03/27
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2017-03-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2017-02-08SenateVote to Draft
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback