CT SB00355 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To authorize the Office of Consumer Counsel to retain consultants with regard to participation in the New England Power Pool.
Title
An Act Concerning Representation Of The State's Interests Before The New England Power Pool.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Energy and Technology |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 284 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 206 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |