CT SB00350 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - File Number 657
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - File Number 657
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require the posting of a decommissioning bond for certain solar projects that are installed on prime farmland in order to provide for the return of such land to a productive agricultural condition.
Title
An Act Requiring The Posting Of A Decommissioning Bond For Certain Solar Projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | File Number 657 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-30 | Senate | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 291 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 163 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |