CT SB00350 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To create a state-wide process improvement initiative for purposes of increasing productivity in state government.
Title
An Act Concerning The State-wide Process Improvement Initiative.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 385 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 262 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |