CT SB00348 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate the enforcement of restrictions concerning farm products that can be sold as "Connecticut-Grown" and to better enable markets in the state to be certified as "Connecticut-Grown Markets".
Title
An Act Concerning The Sale Of Farm Products As "connecticut-grown".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 368 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 138 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 138 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Public Act 15-245 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-07 | Senate | House Calendar Number 508 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6672 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-17 | Senate | File Number 87 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 113 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |