CT SB00347 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require the consent of the party to a consent order with the Department of Energy and Environmental Protection before such order can be modified or revoked and enable the parties to such a consent order to seek relief from the courts concerning the terms, conditions and compliance with such order.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Consent Orders Entered Into By The Commissioner Of Energy And Environmental Protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-25SenateNo New File by Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-24SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-24SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-24SenateJoint Favorable
2018-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
2018-04-05SenateFile Number 290
2018-04-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 162
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-05SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-09SenatePublic Hearing 03/16
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback