CT SB00347 | 2015 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To remove the seventy-per-cent cap on the use of state and federal funds for the purchase of open space.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Percentage Of State And Federal Funds That May Be Used To Purchase Open Space Under The Open Space And Watershed Land Acquisition Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 139 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor
2015-05-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2015-05-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2015-05-26SenatePublic Act 15-23
2015-05-18SenateIn Concurrence
2015-05-18SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2015-05-18SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2015-05-07SenateHouse Calendar Number 507
2015-05-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2015-05-06SenateOn Consent Calendar
2015-05-06SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2015-05-06SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6670
2015-03-17SenateFile Number 86
2015-03-17SenateSenate Calendar Number 112
2015-03-17SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2015-03-17SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-03-10SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/15 5:00 PM
2015-03-03SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2015-02-27SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2015-01-23SenatePublic Hearing 02/04
2015-01-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback