CT SB00347 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To revise the state's open space plan by increasing the frequency of revisions to such plan, identifying lands appropriate for preservation as open space that are held by state agencies and water companies, identifying lands of highest priority for conservation and making recommendations for the establishment of a system to accurately keep track of lands preserved as open space.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The State's Open Space Plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 257 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2012-05-31 Transmitted to the Secretary of State
2012-05-29 Public Act 12-152
2012-05-09 In Concurrence
2012-05-09 On Consent Calendar
2012-05-09 House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-09 House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-04 House Calendar Number 506
2012-05-04 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2012-05-02 On Consent Calendar
2012-05-02 Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2012-05-02 Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4132
2012-04-24 File Number 589
2012-04-24 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-24 New File by Committee on Appropriations
2012-04-24 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-19 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/24/12 5:00 PM
2012-04-16 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-13 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-04-10 Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2012-04-04 File Number 265
2012-04-04 Senate Calendar Number 208
2012-04-04 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-04 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-29 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/12 5:00 PM
2012-03-22 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-03-21 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-03-09 Public Hearing 03/16
2012-03-05 Referred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback