CT SB00345 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-05 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funding for the water taxi at the Thames River Heritage Park and enable such taxi to operate on a more permanent and regular basis.
Title
An Act Concerning The Water Taxi At The Heritage Park In The Towns Of Groton And New London.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/04 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |