CT SB00342 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 286
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 286
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide for the authorization of certain alternative treatment septic systems under the authority of the Department of Public Health.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Certain Alternative Treatment Septic Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 286 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 158 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |