CT SB00341 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - House Calendar Number 561
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a consumer awareness, education and clothing labeling program that is intended to reduce the amount of microfiber plastic in the state's waterways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Clothing Fiber Pollution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 236 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07SenateHouse Calendar Number 561
2018-05-07SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-07SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2018-05-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-07SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4411
2018-04-05SenateFile Number 285
2018-04-05SenateSenate Calendar Number 157
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-05SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-03-09SenatePublic Hearing 03/14
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Environment

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback