CT SB00340 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - File Number 218
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) permit municipalities to adopt an ordinance requiring a person applying for renewal of a tobacco dealer's license to inform the chief law enforcement official, or such official's designee, of the application, (2) permit such chief or designee to submit comments regarding the application, and (3) require the Commissioner of Revenue Services to consider such comments prior to approving such an application.
Title
An Act Concerning Tobacco Dealer Licenses.
Sponsors
House Public Safety and Security Committee | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Ronald Napoli [D] |
Rep. Greg Howard [R] | Rep. Alphonse Paolillo [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | File Number 218 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 164 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |