CT SB00338 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funds through the community investment account for combatting invasive species that affect lakes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of Community Investment Account Funds For Combatting Invasive Species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 284 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 156 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |