CT SB00336 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-06 - House Calendar Number 541
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To establish a state-wide community shared solar program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Community Shared Solar.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 201 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5029 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 202 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 19 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-06SenateHouse Calendar Number 541
2018-05-06SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-04SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-04SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5029
2018-04-16SenateFile Number 518
2018-04-16SenateSenate Calendar Number 322
2018-04-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-16SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-09SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/18 10:00 AM
2018-03-29SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-29SenateJoint Favorable
2018-03-02SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback