CT SB00333 | 2013 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - House Calendar Number 543
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-09 - House Calendar Number 543
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To study the correlation between student attendance and drop-out rates in relation to student financial aid disbursements at the regional community-technical colleges.
Title
An Act Requiring A Study Of Student Attendance And Drop-out Rates In Relation To Financial Aid Disbursements At The Regional-community Technical Colleges.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Sen. Joan Hartley [D] | Rep. Michael Molgano [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 199 PASS (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | House Calendar Number 543 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | File Number 433 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 313 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/10/13 5:00 PM |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |