CT SB00324 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical and other changes to statutes concerning the Department of Social Services.
Title
An Act Concerning Department Of Social Services And Aging Programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 299 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Public Act 14-116 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-24 | Senate | House Calendar Number 445 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | File Number 178 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 142 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |