CT SB00321 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-13 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a task force to study potential cost savings in the Medicaid program.
Title
An Act Concerning Medicaid Cost Savings.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] |
Rep. Theresa Conroy [D] | Rep. Joseph Serra [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 302 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 182 PASS (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Public Act 14-206 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 472 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-24 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3964 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | File Number 281 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 203 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/11 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |