CT SB00314 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To facilitate the establishment of heritage parks by eliminating the requirement for the establishment of advisory boards.
Title
An Act Concerning The Heritage Parks Advisory Boards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 220 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 172 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Public Act 14-43 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-02 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 462 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2014-04-01 | Senate | File Number 230 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 172 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |