CT SB00314 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require state agencies, departments and offices to include a question on any new forms or publications sent to the public asking if the recipient is a member of the armed forces or a veteran who would like information regarding veterans' benefits. A state agency, department or office that received a form or publication indicating that the sender is a member of the armed forces or a veteran who would like information regarding veterans' benefits would forward the individual's contact information to the Department of Veterans' Affairs to be added to the department's contact list.
Title
An Act Concerning Military Or Veteran Status On State-issued Forms And Publications, Benefits For Veterans And State Employees Called To Active Service And The Disposition Of Remains Of Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-07 | File Number 348 | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Calendar Number 226 | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-07 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-25 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-24 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-11 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-02-26 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs |