CT SB00309 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 254
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-04 - File Number 254
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To study the feasibility of restoring a program providing state-funded medical assistance for assisted living and nursing facility care for certain noncitizens who are lawfully present.
Title
An Act Concerning A Study Of Medical Assistance For Certain Legally Present Noncitizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | File Number 254 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 180 |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/07 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |