CT SB00308 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a reappointment process for the Child Advocate, to establish the compensation of the Child Advocate, and to make other revisions to the statutes relating to the responsibilities of the Child Advocate.
Title
An Act Concerning The Recommendations Of The Office Of The Child Advocate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 230 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 303 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 303 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 22-135 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 551 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5594 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | File Number 152 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 139 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |