CT SB00305 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To provide funding to the Connecticut Center for Advanced Technology for its "Dream It. Do It." program.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For The "dream It. Do It." Manufacturing Pipeline Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |