CT SB00302 | 2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To require fiscal notes by the Office of Fiscal Analysis to include an estimate of the number of businesses that would be affected by proposed legislation and an estimated fiscal impact on such businesses and, for regulatory flexibility analyses of proposed regulations, to redefine small business to include any business with two hundred fifty or fewer employees and to require additional information in such analyses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Impact Of Proposed Regulations On Small Businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 439 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - House - House Roll Call Vote 313 (Y: 106 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 444 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 230 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 171 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 175 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-20HouseIn Concurrence
2016-06-20HouseVeto Overruled, House
2016-06-20HouseHouse Reconsidered
2016-06-20HouseImmediate Transmittal to the House
2016-06-20SenateSenate Reconsidered, Veto Overruled
2016-06-20SenateSenate Reconsidered
2016-05-31SenateVetoed by the Governor
2016-05-16SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2016-05-16SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2016-05-06SenatePublic Act 16-32
2016-05-02SenateIn Concurrence
2016-05-02SenateHouse Passed
2016-04-22SenateHouse Calendar Number 483
2016-04-22SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2016-04-21SenateOn Consent Calendar
2016-04-21SenateSenate Passed
2016-04-12SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-04-11SenateJoint Favorable
2016-04-06SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
2016-03-30SenateFile Number 321
2016-03-30SenateSenate Calendar Number 223
2016-03-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2016-03-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/16 5:00 PM
2016-03-16SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2016-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2016-02-26SenatePublic Hearing 03/01
2016-02-25SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Commerce

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback