CT SB00302 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical revisions to the education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Technical Revisions To The Education Statutes.
Sponsors
Sen. Eileen Daily [D] | House Education Committee | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] |
Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 251 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 180 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-11 | Public Act 12-59 | |
2012-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-05 | House Passed | |
2012-04-27 | House Calendar Number 450 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-25 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Passed | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 126 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Calendar Number 120 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |