CT SB00302 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow state funding for demolition, redevelopment and new construction of affordable housing located at or below the five-hundred-year flood elevation.
Title
An Act Concerning State Funding Of Affordable Housing Located In A Five-hundred-year Flood Plain.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Crisco [D] | Rep. Paul Davis [D] | Sen. Toni Harp [D] | Sen. Gary LeBeau [D] |
Rep. John Mazurek [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. Jason Rojas [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-05 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 392 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 305 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2010-05-20 | Public Act 10-139 | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate | |
2010-05-05 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-05 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2010-05-05 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5497 | |
2010-05-05 | Rules Suspended | |
2010-05-04 | House Calendar Number 507 | |
2010-05-04 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2010-05-03 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |
2010-05-03 | On Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Passed | |
2010-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Commerce | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-22 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce | |
2010-04-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-21 | No New File by Committee on Environment | |
2010-04-20 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-20 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |
2010-04-06 | File Number 297 | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Calendar Number 218 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM | |
2010-03-18 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-17 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/05 | |
2010-02-24 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |