CT SB00296 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 279
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - File Number 279
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish a pilot program to better serve people waiting for residential services from the Department of Developmental Services.
Title
An Act Establishing A Pilot Program To Serve People Seeking Residential Services From The Department Of Developmental Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 279 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 188 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/16 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |