CT SB00295 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - House Calendar Number 461
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-25 - House Calendar Number 461
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Department of Public Health's recommendation regarding waiver of its sovereign immunity.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Public Health's Recommendation Regarding Waiver Of Sovereign Immunity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 168 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Senate | House Calendar Number 461 |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-16 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | Senate | File Number 121 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 114 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |