CT SB00294 | 2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To require state criminal background checks for certain individuals applying for employment with the Department of Children and Families and to require annual criminal background checks for all employees of the Departments of Developmental Services and Children and Families who work directly with individuals receiving services from said departments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Criminal Background Checks And The Departments Of Children And Families And Developmental Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-29SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-29SenateNo New File by Committee on Appropriations
2014-04-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-28SenateJoint Favorable
2014-04-24SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
2014-04-23SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-23SenateNo New File by Committee on Public Health
2014-04-23SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-23SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-23SenateJoint Favorable
2014-04-17SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
2014-04-16SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-04-16SenateNo New File by Committee on Human Services
2014-04-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-04-15SenateJoint Favorable
2014-04-09SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Human Services
2014-03-27SenateFile Number 177
2014-03-27SenateSenate Calendar Number 141
2014-03-27SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2014-03-27SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-21SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/14 5:00 PM
2014-03-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2014-03-11SenateJoint Favorable
2014-02-28SenatePublic Hearing 03/06
2014-02-26SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback