CT SB00285 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To give the State Treasurer greater discretion in divesting investments in companies that fail to adopt the MacBride principles and to sunset the requirement for such divestures after January 1, 2020.
Title
An Act Concerning The Macbride Principles.
Sponsors
House Appropriations Committee | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] | Rep. Henry Genga [D] | Rep. Lawrence Miller [R] |
Rep. Prasad Srinivasan [R] | Rep. Christopher Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 294 (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 PASS (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 177 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3849 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 178 PASS (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 177 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 3849 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-203 | |
2012-05-09 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | House Passed | |
2012-04-27 | House Calendar Number 449 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Passed | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 3849 | |
2012-04-18 | File Number 523 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 347 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-03-12 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |