CT SB00283 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make minor, technical and conforming changes to the banking laws.
Title
An Act Concerning The Banking Laws, The Uniform Commercial Code, The Electronic Fund Transfer Act And Mortgagors In Good Standing.
Sponsors
House Banks Committee | Sen. Kevin Witkos [R] | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] | Rep. Hilda Santiago [D] |
Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] | Sen. Carlo Leone [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 161 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 123 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 123 PASS (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Public Act 14-7 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-04-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2014-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 428 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 379 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 244 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/04 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |