CT SB00282 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-23 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-23 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include teen dating violence education in the prescribed courses of study in the public school curriculum.
Title
An Act Concerning The Inclusion Of Teen Dating Violence Awareness And Prevention And The Safe Use Of Social Media In The Public School Curriculum And The Availability Of An On-line Study Skills Curriculum.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 378 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 256 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |