CT SB00276 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the acceptance of off-track betting wagers and advance deposit wagers by any person or business organization other than the authorized operator of the off-track betting system.
Title
An Act Concerning Off-track Betting Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-05 | Senate | File Number 273 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 182 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/15 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |