CT SB00273 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - File Number 522
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - File Number 522
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To make changes to the Care4Kids subsidy program to allow minor parents attending high school to be eligible for the program, allow women on maternity leave to continue to receive Care4Kids during their leave, extend the eligibility to unemployed recipients seeking employment, and to adjust payment rates for the program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Care 4 Kids Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Candelaria [D] | Rep. Minnie Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Marie Kirkley-Bey [D] | Rep. Bruce Morris [D] |
Rep. Hector Robles [D] | House Select Committee on Children | Rep. John Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | File Number 522 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Calendar Number 346 | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-12 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-04-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-03 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-03-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-14 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-13 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |